CA SB1397 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1014, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1014, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 19300 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to automated external defibrillators.
Title
Automated external defibrillators: requirement: modifications to existing buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1397 Hill Senate Third Reading By BERMAN (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1397 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1397 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1014, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6719.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4457.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4309.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | April 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 19300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 19301 | New Code | See Bill Text |