CA SB1394 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 42238.07 of the Education Code, relating to education finance, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Education finance: local control funding formula: implementing regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42238.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |