CA SB139 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12419.3.1 of the Government Code, to amend Section 19265 of, and to amend and repeal Sections 17131.11 and 19554.1 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend and repeal Section 8150 of, and to add and repeal Section 8150.2 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to economic relief, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Golden State Stimulus II: Golden State Stimulus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Assembly - SB 139 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB139 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB139 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB139 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB139 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1688.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-06-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 2125.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-06-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 and 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2118.) |
2021-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | (Corrected May 14). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 281.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 5. Page 201.) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12419.3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19265 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19554.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 8150 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |