CA SB139 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11364.6 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to harmful substances.
Title
Harmful substances: local regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | April 5 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | March 22 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11364.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB139 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB139 |