CA SB139 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11357.5 and 11375.5 of, and to add Section 11375.7 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 1000.5 of the Penal Code, relating to controlled substances, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB139 Galgiani Urgency Clause Concurr (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 139 Galgiani Third Reading Urgency By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB139 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 624, Statutes of 2016.
2016-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2016-09-09SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2016-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5560.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2016-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2016-08-22AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6013.) Ordered to the Senate.
2016-08-18AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
2016-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2016-06-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2015-09-01SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2371.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-08-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-08-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-08-19SenateSet for hearing August 24.
2015-08-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1960.) (July 14).
2015-07-09SenateSet for hearing July 14.
2015-05-13SenateMay 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2015-04-22SenateApril 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2015-04-16SenateSet for hearing April 28.
2015-02-05SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-01-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26.
2015-01-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 9).

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11357.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11375.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11375.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1000.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_139&sess=1516&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_bill_20150126_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_bill_20150818_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_bill_20160615_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_bill_20160818_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_bill_20160906_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_bill_20160925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_vote_20150714_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_vote_20150901_0326PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_vote_20160628_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_vote_20160803_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_vote_20160822_0215PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_139_vote_20160831_0214PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback