CA SB1389 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 859.5 of the Penal Code, relating to interrogation.
Title
Interrogation: electronic recordation.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] | Asm. Shirley Weber [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1389 Glazer Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1389 Glazer Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1389 Glazer (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1389 Glazer Senate Third Reading By COOLEY (Y: 63 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1389 Glazer (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 6. Page 5409.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 6096.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 3.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4139.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4009.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3396.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 859.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |