CA SB1387 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 40420 and 40424 of, and to add Section 40426.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.
Title
South Coast Air Quality Management District board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1387 De Leon Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 30 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1387 De Leon Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1387 De Le (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1387 De Leon Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1387 De Le (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 30. Noes 36. Page 6599.) |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5960.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4065.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4009.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3644.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39616 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40420 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40424 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 13104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |