CA SB1384 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 239, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 98.4 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor Commissioner: financially disabled persons: representation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1384 Monning Senate Third Reading By Luz Rivas (Y: 61 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1384 Monning (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 239, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-01SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2020-08-24Senate(Corrected August 26).
2020-08-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 12. Page 5172.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-12AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 11).
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 3796.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-28SenateJune 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14 in L., P.E. & R. pending receipt.
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-03-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-24SenateRead first time.
2020-02-24SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2020-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code98.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback