CA SB1379 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4071.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Pharmacy: remote services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4071.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |