CA SB1376 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 8157 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Career technical education: pilot preapprentice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-10 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-10 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3296.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-12 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |