CA SB1375 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 631, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 631, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2725.4 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Nursing: nurse practitioners and nurse-midwives: abortion and practice standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1375 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1375 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1375 Atkins et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1375 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1375 Atkins et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 631, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5274.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3). |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (June 21). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3910.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3794.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 3438.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 3308.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2725.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |