CA SB1369 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49423.5.1 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: specialized physical health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1369&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1369_bill_20120224_introduced.html |