CA SB1365 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Water, Parks and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2941 of, and to add Sections 2941.5, 2944, and 2946 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to the Salton Sea.
Title
Salton Sea: Office of Salton Sea Restoration: design-build contract: reorganization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1365 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1365 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | June 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 5955.) |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4359.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4788.) (April 24). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2941.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2944 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 2946 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 31121 | New Code | See Bill Text |