CA SB136 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 590, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 590, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 667.5 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.
Title
Sentencing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB136 Wiener (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 136 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 41 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB136 Wiener et al (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 136 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 41 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB136 Wiener et al (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 590, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 16. Page 2948.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 37. Page 3505.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 1337.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 440.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 667.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |