CA SB1356 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3307.) Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-19 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3307.) Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15202 and 15203 of the Government Code, relating to counties.
Title
Counties: homicide trials: reimbursement.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Berryhill [R] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Dave Cogdill [R] | Sen. Jeff Denham [R] |
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3307.) Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 19. | |
2010-04-15 | Set for hearing April 21. Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 61(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3209.) | |
2010-04-07 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 3103.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-04-05 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-03-09 | Set for hearing April 7. | |
2010-03-04 | To Coms. on L. GOV. and PUB. S. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |