CA SB1349 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 221.9 to the Education Code, relating to school athletics.
Title
School athletics: information relating to competitive athletics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1349 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1349 Jackson Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Jackson (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1349 Jackson Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Jackson (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 4411.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 5907.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to Com. on ED.) suspended. (Page 5606.) |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3699.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3036.) (April 2). |
2014-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 221.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |