CA SB1349 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 99120) to Part 65 of Division 14 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to social media privacy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social media privacy: postsecondary education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1349 Yee Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1349 Yee Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Higher Education (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1349 Yee (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2012-08-24 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2012-08-21 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4628.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-16 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-16 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-13 Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2012-08-09 From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2012-08-06 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
2012-07-05 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2012-06-26 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2012-06-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-06-07 Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED.
2012-06-04 Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
2012-05-25 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-25 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 3617.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-22 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-21 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2012-05-11 Set for hearing May 21.
2012-05-02 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-05-01 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 25).
2012-04-19 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3231.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. Set for hearing April 25.
2012-04-12 Set for hearing April 18.
2012-04-09 Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
2012-03-27 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-03-08 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-02-27 Read first time.
2012-02-26 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2012-02-24 Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code99120New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code980New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code11167Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1349&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120224_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120327_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120502_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120625_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120806_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120822_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_bill_20120927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120418_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120425_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120525_1002AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120626_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120703_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120808_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120816_1053AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1301-1350/sb_1349_vote_20120821_1105AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback