CA SB1345 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-23 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11350.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to controlled substances, and calling an election, to take effect immediately.
Title
Controlled substances: repeat offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11350.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1345 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB1345 |