CA SB134 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10609.27 to the Water Code, relating to water conservation.
Title
Water conservation: water losses: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SB 134 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB134 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB134 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 203, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2755.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1033.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 622.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 15. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10609.27 | New Code | See Bill Text |