CA SB134 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 6032.5 to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 1564.5 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to attorneys.
Title
State Bar of California: Interest on Lawyers' Trust
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB134 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 134 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB134 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 134 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 65 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB134 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 488, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2661.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 13. Page 2950.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1293.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1147.) (May 28). |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 921.) (May 5). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 6032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 6032.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 69741.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1564.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 6032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |