CA SB1339 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Set for hearing May 25.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4.5 (commencing with Section 8370) to Division 4.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electricity: electrical grid resiliency deployment plans: microgrids.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 17).
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code769Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code8370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback