CA SB1338 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 319, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on September 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 319, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1374.723 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10144.54 to the Insurance Code, to amend Section 1370.01 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 5801 and 5813.5 of, and to add Part 8 (commencing with Section 5970) to Division 5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to courts.
Title
Community Assistance, Recovery, and Empowerment (CARE) Court Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1338 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1338 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1338 Umberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1338 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gipson (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1338 Umberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 319, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-02 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3916.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3793.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | May 9 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3543.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD., HEALTH, and HUMAN S. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27 in HEALTH pending receipt. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | April 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.723 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10144.54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1370.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5813.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5970 | New Code | See Bill Text |