CA SB1335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 610, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 42370) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid waste: food service packaging: state agencies, facilities, and property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1335 Allen Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1335 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1335 Allen Senate Third Reading By BLOOM Amendment Set #1 (Y: 45 N: 24 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1335 Allen et al (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 610, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 6175.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 6198.)
2018-08-31SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6145.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-08-31SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 45. Noes 24. Page 6548.)
2018-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 25).
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4395.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4308.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-03SenateMay 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4720.) (April 18).
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code42370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback