CA SB1328 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-03 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 66407.5, 66407.6, and 66407.8 to the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: textbooks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1328 De León (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 3662.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3595.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-07 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-25 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-18 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3120.) (April 11). | |
2012-03-28 | Set for hearing April 11. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66407.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66407.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66407.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |