CA SB1327 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 763, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 763, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12019.5 to the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
State government: business information: Internet Web
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1327 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1327 Cannella Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1327 Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1327 Cannella Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1327 Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 763, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4852.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 5. Page 6199.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2012-06-25 | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5409.) | |
2012-06-15 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3644.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-10 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3103.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12019.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |