CA SB1313 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
Pending: Assembly Privacy and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 17.5 (commencing with Section 28155) to Chapter 5 of Division 12 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicle equipment: driver monitoring defeat devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1313 Ashby (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1313 Ashby (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and P. & C.P. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3893.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 3536.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9 in TRANS. pending receipt. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 28155 | New Code | See Bill Text |