CA SB1313 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-15 - August 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-15 - August 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19812 and 19814 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to the California Gambling Control Commission.
Title
California Gambling Control Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1313 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1313 Vidak (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4213.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19812 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 19814 | Amended Code | Citation Text |