CA SB1313 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.78 to the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Tribal gaming: compact ratification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1313 Hall Urgency Clause Concurr (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1313 Hall Third Reading Urgency By DODD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1313 Hall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1313 Hall Third Reading Urgency By DODD (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1313 Hall (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5408.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6090.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cooper. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12012.78 | New Code | See Bill Text |