CA SB1301 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 49062 of the Education Code, relating to pupil records.
Title
Pupil records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-03 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-04-27 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2010-04-26 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3183.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-03-17 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on ED. | |
2010-02-21 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |