CA SB13 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 653, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 65852.2 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Section 17980.12 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accessory dwelling units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unifinished Business SB13 Wieckowski (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 13 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Voepel (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB13 Wieckowski et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 653, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2938.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-13SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 3534.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-12AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-07-01AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-06-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2019-06-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2019-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1216.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-05-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-05-06SenateMay 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10).
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-04SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 551.) (April 2).
2019-03-26SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2019-03-20SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
2019-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65852.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code17980.12Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback