CA SB1297 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39743 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Low-embodied carbon building materials: carbon sequestration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1297 Cortese (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1297 Cortese (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 3873.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3791.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3517.) (April 26). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3239.) (March 28). |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 28. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and N.R. & W. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39743 | New Code | See Bill Text |