CA SB1297 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 1.5 (commencing with Section 12095) to Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Office of the State Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12095 | New Code | See Bill Text |