CA SB1292 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 435, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 435, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 44670) to Chapter 3 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: principals: evaluation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-23 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1292 Liu Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1292 Liu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1292 Liu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1292 Liu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1292 Liu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 435, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-23 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4762.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 6069.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-20 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13). | |
2012-05-17 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-05-07 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-07 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-02 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3302.) (April 25). | |
2012-04-16 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-04-13 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2012-04-11 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 18. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44670 | New Code | See Bill Text |