CA SB1291 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1269 and 1274.10 ofthe Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Unemployment benefits: training: teacher credentialing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1291 Evans Senate Third Reading By SOLORIO (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Evans (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1291 Evans (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 278, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-24 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6068.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 3653.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-25 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3595.) (May 24). | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-07 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-25 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 11.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1274.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |