CA SB1282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 10.85 (commencing with Section 11999.14) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to opioids.
Title
Opioid Master Settlement Agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | April 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | April 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27 in HEALTH pending receipt. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referral to Com. on PUB. S. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD., HEALTH, and PUB. S. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11999.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |