CA SB1280 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 116681 and 116682 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.
Title
Drinking water: consolidation and extension of service: at-risk water systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and GOV. & F. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 116681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 116682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1280 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1280 |