CA SB128 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17074.25 and 17078.72 of the Education Code, relating to school facilities, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School facilities funding: high-performance schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-08-30 - Assembly - SB 128 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By BROWNLEY (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB128 Lowenthal (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2011.
2011-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2011-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2011-08-30 In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2011-08-30 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2693.) Ordered to the Senate.
2011-08-26 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-07-07 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2011-06-23 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-13 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-06-02 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-06-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1221.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-27 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-26 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1113.) (May 26).
2011-05-20 Set for hearing May 26.
2011-04-11 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2011-04-01 Set for hearing April 11.
2011-03-22 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-21 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 360.) (March 16).
2011-03-08 Set for hearing March 16.
2011-02-10 Referred to Com. on ED.
2011-01-28 From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
2011-01-27 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code17074.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code17078.72Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_128&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20110127_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20110322_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20110901_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_bill_20111008_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110316_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110411_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110526_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110601_1132AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110622_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110825_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_128_vote_20110830_1048AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback