CA SB1269 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 28160 of the Vehicle Code, relating to schoolbus safety, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schoolbus safety: child safety alert system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2018-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-16SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Coms. on I., B. & F.I. and JUD.
2018-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2018-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code22001Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22655New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code28160Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback