CA SB1262 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 3164.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 3164.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 22869.5 and 22917 to the Government Code, and to amend Sections 17072, 17131.4, 17131.5, 17215, 17215.1, 17215.4, and 19184 of, and to add Sections 17138.5, 17138.6, and 17216 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to health care, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
High deductible health plans: health savings accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-12 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 3. Page 3164.) Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-03-26 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2010-03-04 | To Coms. on P.E. & R. and REV. & TAX. | |
2010-02-20 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |