CA SB126 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 47604.1 to the Education Code, relating to charter schools.
Title
Charter schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] | Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Edwin Chau [D] |
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - SB 126 Leyva Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB126 Leyva et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB126 Leyva et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-03-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 531.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (February 26). |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | Coauthors Revised. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 202.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 191.) (February 19). |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Set for hearing February 19 in ED. pending receipt. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 47604.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |