CA SB126 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1156.3, 1158, 1160.4, and 1164 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Agricultural labor relations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB126 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 126 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 126 Steinberg Senate Third Reading Amend By ALEJO Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB126 Steinberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-09 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-08 - Assembly - SB 126 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By ALEJO (Y: 50 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-09-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - Assembly - SB 126 Steinberg Senate Third Reading Amend By ALEJO Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent #3 SB126 Steinberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 697, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2011-09-09 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2442.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2499.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 2480.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-09-08 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2011-09-08 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 3060.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-09-07 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-09-06 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 6). | |
2011-09-02 | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2805.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 2861.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2867.) | |
2011-08-15 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-07-14 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-07-13 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). | |
2011-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-21 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and B., P. & C.P. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2011-05-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-05-18 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 929.) (May 9). | |
2011-05-03 | Set for hearing May 9. | |
2011-04-14 | Set for hearing May 2. | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 643.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-04-04 | Set for hearing April 12. | |
2011-03-10 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-04 | Set for hearing March 29. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-01-28 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14521.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 1156.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1158 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1160.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |