CA SB1253 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12206, 17058, and 23610.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: low-income housing: credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4996.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4904.) (May 1). |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65583 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 12206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17058 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23610.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |