CA SB1249 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13100 of, and to add Chapter 7.4 (commencing with Section 1745) to Division 2 of, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife resources.
Title
Department of Fish and Game: lands: expenditures.
Sponsors
Asm. Jared Huffman [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1249 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1249 Wolk Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1249 Wolk (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1249 Wolk Senate Third Reading By HUFFMAN (Y: 67 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1249 Wolk (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 597, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 5019.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-29 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 9. Page 6570.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6254.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6089.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-07-03 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 3704.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3594.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-18 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-04-30 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-20 | Set for hearing April 30. | |
2012-04-17 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3122.) (April 10). | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. (Corrected April 11.) | |
2012-03-29 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 13100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 1528 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 1745 | New Code | See Bill Text |