CA SB1243 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 52.7 (commencing with Section 88670) to Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: The California State Pathways in Technology Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1243 Portantino (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4412.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4306.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4622.) (April 11).
2018-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-13SenateMarch 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 21.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code88670New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback