CA SB1243 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 101.7, 149, 201, 312, 4800, 4804.5, 4836.2, 4841.5, 4844, 11506, and 22259 of, and to add Sections 154.1, 211, and 312.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1243 Lieu Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1243 Lieu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1243 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1243 Lieu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1243 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4877.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6425.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3606.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3712.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3278.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 101.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 11506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 154.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 312 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 312.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4804.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4836.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4841.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4844 | Amended Code | Citation Text |