CA SB1239 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-06 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 81004, 81007, 81007.5, 81008, 81009, 81010, 82006, 84101, 84101.5, 84102, 84103, 84108, 84200.8, 84203, 84204, 84204.5, 84211, 84213, 84215, 84219, 84223, 84504.2, 84602, 84605, 84606, 84612, 84615, 85200, 86100, 86103, 86104, 86105, 86107, 86108, 86109.5, 86114, 86116, and 86118 of, and to repeal Sections 84217 and 86109 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign disclosures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1239 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1239 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1239 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5873.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-13AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-06-13AssemblyJune 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2018-05-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-07SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4966.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4697.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code81004Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code81007Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code81007.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code81008Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code81009Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code81010Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code82006Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84101Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84101.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84102Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84103Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84108Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84200.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84203Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84204Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84204.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84211Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84213Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84215Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84217Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code84219Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84223Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84504.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84602Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84605Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84606Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84612Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code84615Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code85200Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86100Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86103Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86104Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86105Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86107Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86108Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86109Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code86109.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86114Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86116Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code86118Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback