CA SB1238 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1250.2 and 1275.1 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 4080, 5008, 5404, and 5675 of, and to add Sections 4080.5, 5400.1, and 5675.05 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to behavioral health.
Title
Health facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1238 Eggman Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1238 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1238 Eggman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1238 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Wood (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1238 Eggman (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-04 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6658.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | June 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4087.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3976.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3636.) (April 16). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3561.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1250.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1275.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4080.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5400.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5404 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5675 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 5675.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |