CA SB1232 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13953 of the Government Code, relating to victims of crime, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of crime: application for compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1232 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1232 Bradford Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1232 Bradford (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6304.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-07-02AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4834.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4769.) (April 23).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4628.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-16SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18.
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13953Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback