CA SB1221 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13515.25 of the Penal Code, relating to firefighters.
Title
Firefighters: interaction with persons with mental disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Special Consent SB1221 Hertzberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1221 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1221 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1221 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1221 Hertzberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6018.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3713.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8, be amended, and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3522.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13515.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |