CA SB1219 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14836, 14837, 14838, 14838.5, 14838.64, 14838.7, 14839, 14839.1, 14840, 14842, and 14842.5 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 10111 of the Public Contract Code, relating to state contracting.
Title
Small Business Procurement and Contract Act: employment social enterprises.
Sponsors
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1219 Hancock Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1219 Hancock Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1219 Hancock Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1219 Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1219 Hancock Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 79 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1219 Hancock Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1219 Hancock (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-25 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-25 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 6 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5407.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 1. Page 6094.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5964.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4086.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4006.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14836 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14837 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838.64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14839 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14839.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14842 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14842.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |